FL H1333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises boundaries of Suwannee River Water Management District & Southwest Florida Water Management District to include all of Levy County within Suwanee River Water Management District boundary; provides for transfer of land & other incidentals.
Title
Water Management District Boundaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S386 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 0691 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1333 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1333/BillText/Filed/PDF |