FL H1377 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Open Educational Resources Grant Program; requires DOE & BOG to administer program; provides requirements for program; & specifies that implementation of program is subject to legislative appropriation.
Title
Open Educational Resources Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S602 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1377 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1377/BillText/Filed/PDF |