FL H1389 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limits sales tax exemption for sale of marijuana & marijuana delivery devices to include only sales to qualified patients or caregivers; revises provisions relating to licensure & operation of MMTCs; authorizes certain persons to purchase, possess, use, transport, or transfer marijuana products & delivery devices under certain circumstances; requires licensure by DBPR of certain MMTCs; requires DACS to conduct certain study; requires sentence review hearings under certain circumstances; authorizes certain persons to petition court for expunction of his or her criminal history under certain circumstances; provides criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Availability of Marijuana for Adult Use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1860 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
S1862 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381990Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8931352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430586Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback