FL H1391 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes Division of State Technology from, & adding Florida Digital Service & Division of Telecommunications to, DMS; requires Florida Digital Service to develop enterprise architecture; prohibits DMS from retrieving or disclosing data under circumstances; revises certain standards that DLA, DFS, & DACS must adopt; provides notice requirements if departments adopt alternative standards in lieu of enterprise architecture standards; prohibits Florida Digital Service from retrieving or disclosing data; creates Financial Technology Sandbox within OFR; provides certain exceptions to general law & certain waivers of rule requirements to specified persons; provides Technology Sandbox application requirements; provides that licensees are not immune from civil damages & are subject to criminal & consumer protection laws & certain general laws; authorizes office to issue certain orders & to enforce them; provides appropriation; provides that specified provisions of act are contingent upon passage of other provisions addressing public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology Innovation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#577 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-161
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1870
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (860305) 838
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/02/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-13HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-12HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-11HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1393 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-162
H1395 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S1870 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
S1872 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1393
S1874 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28200515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430415Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback