FL H1395 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits OFR from waiving or modifying fees for Financial Technology Sandbox except as specified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Financial Technology Sandbox

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in State Affairs Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1391 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-161
S1870 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
S1874 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-162

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
560214Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback