FL H1397 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits civil liability for nonprofit organizations operating crisis shelters for certain persons.
Title
Limitation of Actions Against Crisis Shelters
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Delores Hogan Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-07 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs