FL H1407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits operation of vessels at speeds faster than slow speed, minimum wake in hazardous situations; provides requirements for flags displayed from vessels & barges actively engaged in construction operations; prohibits anchoring or mooring of vessel to mangroves & vegetation on public lands; revises civil penalties.
Title
Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1378 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 4109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1407 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1407/BillText/Filed/PDF |