FL H1433 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands authorized uses of drones by law enforcement agencies & other specified entities.
Title
Drones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-13 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S520 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1433 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1433/BillText/Filed/PDF |