FL H1435 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes specified reporting individuals & procurement employees to solicit or accept gifts or compensation from specified persons or entities to be used toward costs incurred due to serious bodily injury or diagnosis of serious disease or illness of individual, employee, or child thereof; specifies limitations & requirements.
Title
Public Officers and Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-10 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall -- Workshopped |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1490 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |