FL H1443 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides boundaries; authorizes DBPR's Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco to issue to bona fide nonprofit civic organization specified number of additional temporary permits to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises at certain events in Ocala Downtown Area; provides requirements to obtain temporary permit; requires division to adopt rules.
Title
City of Ocala, Marion County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#715 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#715 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chapter No. 2014-253 | |
2014-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-05-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-03 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/03/14, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-28 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-28 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-27 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/27/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1414 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1443 (Ch. 2014-253)