FL H2029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1281)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1281)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the City of Opa-locka Crime Prevention Technologies.
Title
City of Opa-locka Crime Prevention Technologies
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1281) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2029 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2029/BillText/Filed/PDF |