FL H2053 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Brevard County Water Quality Improvements.
Title
Brevard County Water Quality Improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1635A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-29 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-23 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/23/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-09-12 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2053 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2053/BillText/Filed/PDF |