FL H2085 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 721)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 721)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Re-entry Alliance Pensacola, Inc. (''REAP'') re-entry Portal.
Title
Re-entry Alliance Pensacola, Inc. (''REAP'') re-entry Portal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 721) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-16 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-01-24 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |