FL H2255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hardening Fort Walton Beach Recreation Center for Emergency Operations Center.
Title
Hardening Fort Walton Beach Recreation Center for Emergency Operations Center
Sponsors
Rep. Mel Ponder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2255 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2255/BillText/Filed/PDF |