FL H2303 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Junior Achievement Workforce Readiness Program Expansion.
Title
Junior Achievement Workforce Readiness Program Expansion
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 114) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/14/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-18 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2303 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2303/BillText/Filed/PDF |