FL H2361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Nassau County American Beach Well and Septic Tank Phase Out.
Title
Nassau County American Beach Well and Septic Tank Phase Out
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Sen. Tracie Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1657A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2361 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2361/BillText/Filed/PDF |