FL H2517 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Homeland Heritage Park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeland Heritage Park

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-11-13HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-11-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-11-05HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-10-30HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback