FL H2947 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Holocaust Memorial at the Capitol.
Title
Florida Holocaust Memorial at the Capitol
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Mike Caruso [R] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Rep. David Silvers [D] | Rep. Richard Stark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2947 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2947/BillText/Filed/PDF |