FL H2971 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for The Apalachee Center's Children's Community Action Treatment Team Serving Franklin and Liberty Counties.
Title
The Apalachee Center's Children's Community Action Treatment Team Serving Franklin and Liberty Counties
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2971 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2971/BillText/Filed/PDF |