FL H3163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hillsborough Community College - Advanced Manufacturing and Supply Chain Management.
Title
Hillsborough Community College - Advanced Manufacturing and Supply Chain Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3163 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3163/BillText/Filed/PDF |