FL H3175 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1496)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Feeding Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feeding Florida

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 1496)
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-03-21HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/22/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall --Meeting cancelled
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-02-14HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback