FL H3351 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 575A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 575A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Alternative Treatment for Veterans - University of South Florida.
Title
Alternative Treatment for Veterans - University of South Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 575A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3351 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3351/BillText/Filed/PDF |