FL H3661 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 65)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 65)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Memorial University - Training for the Future of Aerospace.
Title
Florida Memorial University - Training for the Future of Aerospace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 65) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 65) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/14/20, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3661 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3661/BillText/Filed/PDF |