FL H3839 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Selah Freedom Programs and Services for Victims of Sex Trafficking and Exploitation.
Title
Selah Freedom Programs and Services for Victims of Sex Trafficking and Exploitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3839 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3839/BillText/Filed/PDF |