FL H3895 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1332)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1332)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Virgil Hawkins Florida Chapter of the National Bar Association Fellowship Program.
Title
Virgil Hawkins Florida Chapter of the National Bar Association Fellowship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1332) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3895 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3895/BillText/Filed/PDF |