FL H4547 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Wausau - New Fire House.
Title
Wausau - New Fire House
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4547 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4547/BillText/Filed/PDF |