FL H4649 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Gainesville Opportunity Center.
Title
Gainesville Opportunity Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-25 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4649 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4649/BillText/Filed/PDF |