FL H4807 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the City of Winter Haven Dark Fiber Activation of the Industrial Development Zone.
Title
City of Winter Haven Dark Fiber Activation of the Industrial Development Zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4807 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4807/BillText/Filed/PDF |