FL H4859 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2456A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2456A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Bonifay Fire Department Expansion.
Title
Bonifay Fire Department Expansion
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 2456A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-02-24 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4859 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4859/BillText/Filed/PDF |