FL H4885 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1661)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1661)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Sand and Grit Removal Grants for Wastewater Treatment Facilities.
Title
Florida Sand and Grit Removal Grants for Wastewater Treatment Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1661) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/19, 11:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-24 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4885 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4885/BillText/Filed/PDF |