FL H5009 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes UF Board of Trustees to provide or arrange for provision of health & other self-insurance or insurance programs under certain conditions; requires board to offer programs to certain persons; prohibits programs from commencing before specified date; provides requirements for state funding for such programs; provides procedural requirements relating to program for DMS, EOG, & Legislature; provides for state's monthly contribution for employees under state group insurance program; revises conditions under which pharmacies are provided reimbursement for prescription medicines that are dispensed to members of state group health insurance plan under state employees' prescription drug program; authorizes DMS to implement supply limit program for certain maintenance drugs.
Title
Health Insurance Benefits for State Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#113 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1202 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#112 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#109 (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#720 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1202 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#112 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#109 (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#720 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1716 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 21 NAYS 18 -SJ 1404 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 -HJ 1419 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1417 | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Grimsley (Chair), Aubuchon, Chestnut, Dorworth, Frishe, Holder, Hukill, Jones, Legg, Lopez-Cantera, McKeel, Sands, Saunders, Schenck, Snyder, Weatherford -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-23 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 667 | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 666 | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Budget -SJ 546 | |
2012-02-21 | Received -SJ 546 | |
2012-02-14 | In Messages | |
2012-02-09 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 566 | |
2012-02-09 | Read 3rd time -HJ 564 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-08 | Read 2nd time -HJ 535 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/12 | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced -HJ 444 | |
2012-02-02 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |