FL H5401 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-141, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-141, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers specified powers & duties of FWCC relating to environmental crimes to Division of Law Enforcement within DEP; provides for DEP & FWCC memorandum of agreement; provides for reassignment of personnel & retention of benefits; establishes Division of Law Enforcement within DEP; provides specified authority to DEP & FWCC officers; provides for deposit of proceeds in specified DEP trust funds; appoints DEP representative to Joint Task Force on State Agency Law Enforcement Communications; authorizes certain use of Inland Protection Trust Fund moneys; provides penalties for false personation & unlawful use of badges & other symbols of DEP officers.
Title
Department of Environmental Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chapter No. 2019-141, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115) | |
2019-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-04 | House | Immediately certified |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/27/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1502 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141)
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
870 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 7055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |