FL H5507 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1717
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1717
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to reimbursement of Department of Management Services for actual costs of coordinating Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; provides for transfer of funds generated by fees collected for use of DMS's electronic information services from DMS to DFS to support statewide purchasing operations; establishes amount of transfer; repeals provisions which establish executive aircraft pool within DMS; terminates Bureau of Aircraft Trust Fund within DMS; provides for disposition of balances in & revenues of trust fund; prescribes procedures for termination of trust fund; revises expiration date of provisions governing remission of surcharges for specified criminal offenses & noncriminal moving traffic violations to DOR to fund state agency law enforcement radio system & provide technical assistance with respect to statewide systems of regional law enforcement communications.
Title
Department of Management Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1187 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#91 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#711 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#91 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#711 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1717 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 1308 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 -HJ 1329 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1328 | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Hooper (Chair), Berman, Gibbons, Mayfield, Nelson, Patronis, Watson, Weinstein -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-23 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 638 | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 637 | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Budget -SJ 549 | |
2012-02-21 | Received -SJ 549 | |
2012-02-14 | In Messages | |
2012-02-09 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 566 | |
2012-02-09 | Read 3rd time -HJ 560 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-08 | Read 2nd time -HJ 534 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/12 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 457 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -HJ 457 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/01/12, 11:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced -HJ 257 | |
2012-01-24 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |