FL H5511 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1717
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1717
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Division of Drugs, Devices, & Cosmetics within DBPR; conforms provisions to transfer by s. 27, ch. 2010-161, L.O.F., of regulatory authority for ch. 499, F.S., from DOH to DBPR; repeals provisions relating to Florida Drug, Device, & Cosmetic Trust Fund; terminates trust fund & provides for disposition of balances in & revenues of trust fund; prescribes procedures for termination of trust fund; requires DBPR to maintain separate account in Professional Regulation Trust Fund for Drugs, Devices, & Cosmetics program; repeals provisions relating to report & tax requirements for each person or club that holds or shows pugilistic matches on closed circuit telecast viewed within state.
Title
Department of Business and Professional Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1185 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#93 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#713 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#93 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#713 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1717 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1318 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 1325 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1321 | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Hooper (Chair), Berman, Gibbons, Mayfield, Nelson, Patronis, Watson, Weinstein -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-23 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 637 | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Budget | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Budget -SJ 550 | |
2012-02-21 | Received -SJ 549 | |
2012-02-14 | In Messages | |
2012-02-09 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 566 | |
2012-02-09 | Read 3rd time -HJ 561 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-08 | Read 2nd time -HJ 534 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/12 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 457 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 -HJ 457 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/01/12, 11:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 297 | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced -HJ 257 | |
2012-01-24 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |