FL H6005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to possession of firearms in student campus parking.
Title
Possession of Firearms on School Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Education Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Education Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S996 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6005 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6005/BillText/Filed/PDF |