FL H6013 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes provisions providing for death penalty for capital felonies; deletes associated provisions, including provisions relating to representation in death penalty cases, capital collateral representation, jurors in capital cases, prohibiting imposition of death sentence on defendant with mental retardation, determination of whether to impose sentence of death or life imprisonment for capital felony or capital drug trafficking felony, issuance of warrant of execution, stay of execution of death sentence, proceedings when person under sentence of death appears to be insane, proceedings when person under sentence of death appears to be pregnant, grounds for death warrant, execution of death sentence, prohibition against reduction of death sentence as result of determination that method of execution is unconstitutional, sentencing orders in capital cases, regulation of execution, transfer to state prison for safekeeping before death warrant issued, return of warrant of execution issued by Governor, sentence of death unexecuted for unjustifiable reasons, & return of warrant of execution issued by Supreme Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death Penalty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S472 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
H6021 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
186003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21589Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
275304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27708Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77530Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
782065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
922052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
922095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
922105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
922108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
922111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
924055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
924056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
924057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback