FL H6013 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provision prohibiting specified local governments from adopting ordinances or rules imposing price controls upon certain business activities.
Title
Rent Control Measures
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] |
Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-08-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S910 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6013 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6013/BillText/Filed/PDF |