FL H6021 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes prohibition against wearing or displaying certain badges or indicia of authority of certain federal, state, county, or municipal agencies without authorization; deletes requirement that prosecuting attorney open closing arguments after closing of evidence in criminal prosecution; deletes requirement that person convicted & sentenced to death pursue all possible collateral remedies in state court in accordance with specified rules.
Title
Criminal Justice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6013 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S472 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S472 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
918 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
925 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6021 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6021/BillText/Filed/PDF |