FL H6025 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 384 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 384 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Harris Chain of Lakes Restoration Council.
Title
Harris Chain of Lakes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 384 passed |
2020-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-11-13 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-09-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S384 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-52
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 468 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6025 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6025/BillText/Filed/PDF |