FL H6031 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 348 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 348 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes lifetime maximum cap on covered expenses for child enrolled in Florida Healthy Kids program.
Title
Florida Kidcare Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 348 passed |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-10-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S348 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-12
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6031 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6031/BillText/Filed/PDF |