FL H6051 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provision which prohibits certain damages in wrongful death cases to be recoverable by adult children & parents of adult children.
Title
Medical Negligence
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] |
Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-12-05 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6051 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6051/BillText/Filed/PDF |