FL H6059 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DHSMV to oversee program in Miami-Dade County for rebuilt inspection services offered by private sector operators; removes provision providing for repeal of program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rebuilt Motor Vehicle Inspection Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-12HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H385 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
S660 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 311 (Ch. 2019-101), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 725 (Ch. 2019-149), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S898 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
S928 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
319141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback