FL H6059 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Removes provisions relating to prohibition of licensure for certain hospitals that serve specific populations; authorizes positions & provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty Hospitals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#509 (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-03-03SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 74 NAYS 39
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-12HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-30HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-29HouseCS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-29HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-28HouseCS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-16HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-12-30HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback