FL H6061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes aviation fuel tax & provisions related to administration of the tax program.
Title
Aviation Fuel Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1192 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9826 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9835 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9845 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6061 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6061/BillText/Filed/PDF |