FL H6067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts all aircraft sales and leases, rather than sales and leases of certain aircraft, from sales & use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aircraft Sales and Lease Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Ways and Means Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee
2020-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1546 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback