FL H6071 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that only persons convicted of capital or life felonies are liable for liquidated damage amount for incarceration & other correctional costs; removes provisions specifying fixed daily amount for offender's liability for incarceration & other correctional costs for offenders convicted of certain offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Costs of Incarceration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-10HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
960293Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback