FL H6083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Program & authorization to use traffic infraction detectors; repeals provisions relating to distribution of penalties, transitional implementation, & placement & installation; conforms cross-references & provisions to changes made by act.
Title
Traffic Infraction Detectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H903 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1328 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1328 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 00831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 07456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0776 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6083 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6083/BillText/Filed/PDF |