FL H6507 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 28 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 28 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate Clifford Williams for being wrongfully incarcerated for 43 years; directs CFO to draw warrant payable to specified trust; provides that act does not waive certain defenses or increase state's limits of liability.
Title
Relief/Clifford Williams/State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 28 passed |
2020-03-02 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-26 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/26/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-18 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/18/20, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S28 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |