FL H6511 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from State of Florida to compensate Barney Brown for wrongful incarceration; provides that act does not waive certain defenses or increase state's liability; provides appropriation satisfies all present and future claims; prohibits the award of additional amounts for fees, costs, & other expenses.
Title
Relief/Barney Brown/State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S18 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6511 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6511/BillText/Filed/PDF |