FL H6517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for relief of Christeia Jones, as parent & legal guardian of Logan Grant, Denard Maybin, Jr., & Lanard Maybin; providing appropriation to compensate for injuries & damages resulting from the alleged negligence of Trooper Raul Umana & FHP, a division of DHSMV; providing limitation on the payment of costs & fees.
Title
Relief/Christeia Jones, Logan Grant, Denard Maybin, Jr., and Lanard Maybin/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S16 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
603 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |